judyrecords
search tips
700 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

STATE OF TEXAS AND COUNTY OF DALLAS v. EFFIE NELLIE DAWSON

Case: A-10923
A-10923
07/12/1965
Application for Writ of Error
STATE OF TEXAS AND COUNTY OF DALLAS
EFFIE NELLIE DAWSON
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/19/1965Response to PetitionRespondent
07/12/1965Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/31/1966Letter Filed
01/25/1966Order from Lower Court filed
01/19/1966Motion to dismissFiling granted
07/19/1965Response to Petition
07/12/1965Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/12/1965Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
State of Texas and County of DallasPetitioner
Effie Nellie DawsonRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information