Case: A-10911
A-10911
07/05/1965
Application for Writ of Error
RALPH H. BICKLER
MAX BICKLER, ET UX.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/02/1966 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
10/05/1965 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
07/19/1965 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
07/05/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/13/1967 | Motion to Withdraw Filed | Filing granted | | |
06/10/1966 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
06/02/1966 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
05/18/1966 | Letter Filed | | ||
05/18/1966 | Opinion issued | | ||
10/20/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
10/20/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
10/05/1965 | Reply to Response | | ||
07/19/1965 | Response to Petition | | ||
07/05/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
07/05/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Ralph H. Bickler | Petitioner | |
Max Bickler, et ux. | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information