judyrecords
search tips
700 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

STATE OF TEXAS v. SUNLAND SUPPLY COMPANY, INC.

Case: A-10905
A-10905
07/05/1965
Application for Writ of Error
STATE OF TEXAS
SUNLAND SUPPLY COMPANY, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/24/1966Motion for RehearingRespondent
08/09/1965Response to PetitionRespondent
07/05/1965Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/29/1966Response to Motion filed
06/24/1966Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/08/1966Opinion issued
10/06/1965Document received (See Remarks)
08/09/1965Response to Petition
07/05/1965Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/05/1965Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Sunland Supply Company, Inc.Respondent
State of TexasPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information