Case: A-10914
A-10914
07/06/1965
Application for Writ of Error
FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF BOSTON
MAX SILBERSTEIN, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/23/1965 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
07/09/1965 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
07/06/1965 | Errata Filed | Petitioner | | |
07/06/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/02/1966 | Opinion issued | | ||
10/06/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
07/23/1965 | Reply to Response | | ||
07/09/1965 | Response to Petition | | ||
07/06/1965 | Errata Filed | | ||
07/06/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
07/06/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
First National Bank of Boston | Petitioner | |
Max Silberstein, et al. | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information