Case: A-10927
A-10927
07/16/1965
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
GEORGE MONROE SAVELLE, JR.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/16/1965 | Exhibits in case/cause filed | Petitioner | | |
07/16/1965 | Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/11/1966 | Order from Lower Court filed | | ||
01/26/1966 | Opinion issued | | ||
07/21/1965 | Bond | | ||
07/20/1965 | Document filed (see remarks) | | ||
07/16/1965 | Order from Lower Court filed | | ||
07/16/1965 | Exhibits in case/cause filed | | ||
07/16/1965 | Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed | Filing granted | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
George Monroe Savelle, Jr. | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information