Case: PD-1195-02
PD-1195-02
07/10/2002
PDR Case Type
ROCKA, ANGELA
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
10/04/2002 | FINAL DISP | Refused | |
09/18/2002 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
09/18/2002 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
08/20/2002 | NO RESPONSE FILED | | |
07/10/2002 | PDR FILED | | |
07/10/2002 | PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/10/2002 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
ROCKA, ANGELA | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | Ernest Davila |
STATE OF TEXAS | State | Charles A. Rosenthal, Jr. |
Court of Appeals Information:
14-01-00427-CR
AFF 5-2-02
14th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
338th District Court
Harris
Honorable ELSA ALCALA
867828