Case: A-10937
A-10937
07/23/1965
Application for Writ of Error
STATE OF TEXAS
FRANK K. MEYER, ET UX.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/20/1966 | Letter brief | Petitioner | | |
06/13/1966 | Reply to Response | Respondent | | |
06/13/1966 | Brief in Support of Petition | Amicus Curiae | | |
06/10/1966 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
06/02/1966 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
02/23/1966 | Response to Brief filed | Respondent | | |
02/17/1966 | Post submission brief filed | Petitioner | | |
02/07/1966 | Supplemental Brief filed | Respondent | | |
10/11/1965 | Response to Reply filed | Respondent | | |
09/24/1965 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
08/30/1965 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
07/23/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/20/1966 | Letter brief | | ||
06/13/1966 | Reply to Response | | ||
06/13/1966 | Brief in Support of Petition | | ||
06/10/1966 | Reply to Response | | ||
06/07/1966 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
06/02/1966 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
05/18/1966 | Opinion issued | | ||
02/24/1966 | Letter Filed | | ||
02/23/1966 | Response to Brief filed | | ||
02/17/1966 | Post submission brief filed | | ||
02/07/1966 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
10/27/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
10/27/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
10/27/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
10/27/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
10/27/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
10/27/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
10/11/1965 | Response to Reply filed | | ||
09/24/1965 | Reply to Response | | ||
08/30/1965 | Response to Petition | | ||
07/27/1965 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Response | Filing granted | | |
07/23/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
07/23/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Frank K. Meyer, et ux. | Respondent | |
State of Texas | Petitioner | |
City of Houston | Amicus Curiae |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information