Case: A-10939
A-10939
07/23/1965
Application for Writ of Error
MORIN SCOTT, DBA TIDELANDS MOTOR INN
JAMES LIEBMAN
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/31/1966 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
05/23/1966 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
07/27/1965 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
07/23/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/29/1967 | Order from Lower Court filed | | ||
09/29/1967 | Motion to Withdraw Filed | Filing granted | | |
05/31/1966 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
05/23/1966 | Motion for Rehearing | | ||
05/18/1966 | Dissenting opinion issued. | | ||
05/18/1966 | Concurring Opinion issued. | | ||
05/18/1966 | Opinion issued | | ||
10/13/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
10/13/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
10/13/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
07/27/1965 | Response to Petition | | ||
07/23/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
07/23/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
James Liebman | Respondent | |
Morin Scott, dba Tidelands Motor Inn | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information