judyrecords
search tips
700 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

M. H. WORTHINGTON v. HERMAN L. SANDERS, ET AL.

Case: A-10916
A-10916
07/06/1965
Application for Writ of Error
M. H. WORTHINGTON
HERMAN L. SANDERS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/29/1965Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/12/1965Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/27/1965Response to Brief filedRespondent
09/29/1965Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
07/15/1965Response to PetitionRespondent
07/06/1965Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/29/1965Motion for Rehearing
11/12/1965Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/27/1965Response to Brief filed
09/29/1965Brief in Support of Petition
07/15/1965Response to Petition
07/06/1965Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/06/1965Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Herman L. Sanders, et al.Respondent
M. H. WorthingtonPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information