judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROBERT L. MCGUIRE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 81-CF-1240
Short Caption:ROBERT L. MCGUIRE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Lead:81-CF-1240Consolidated: 81-CF-1380 , 85-CF-0040 , 85-CF-0063
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F933-80Filed Date:09/18/1981

Opening Event Date:09/18/1981Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/30/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/12/1985
Argued/Submitted:01/09/1986
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
AppellantRobert L. Mcguire N
Gerald I. Fisher YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Ilene G. Rosenthal YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MCGUIRE, ROBERT L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1906 VACATED BRADLEY S. STETLER
09/18/1981FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/30/1982FiledRecord Completed
09/12/1985FiledBriefing Completed
01/09/1986FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/02/1986FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition