judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CLARK CO. EDUC. ASS'N VS. CLARK CO. SCHOOL DIST.

Case Information: 36206
Short Caption:CLARK CO. EDUC. ASS'N VS. CLARK CO. SCHOOL DIST.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A385070Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/07/2000 / Kunin, IsraelSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/01/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Dyer, Lawrence, Cooney & Penrose--check no. 6098.
06/01/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-09249
06/07/2000Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 00-09633
06/07/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Israel Kunin. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
06/26/2000MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation to Extend Time to Serve the Settlement Statement to the Settlement Judge, Israel Kunin. 00-10920
07/10/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Stipulation Disapproved. On June 26, 2000, the parties filed a stipulation for an extension of time to submit the settlement statement to the settlement judge. Settlement statements are to be submitted directly to the settlement judge. We disapprove the parties' stipulation, without prejudice to their right to seek relief directly from the settlement judge. 00-11669
10/06/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 00-17733
10/06/2000Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 00-17735
10/17/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. NNP/CLK 00-18364
10/17/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.