judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

THOMPSON (CALVIN) VS. STATE C/W 33421

Case Information: 34603
Short Caption:THOMPSON (CALVIN) VS. STATE C/W 33421Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 33421 *, 34603
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C81856Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/14/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/02/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/02/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07071
11/02/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Consolidation. This court elects to consolidate these appeals for disposition. Within 120 days from the date of this order, the clerk of the district court shall transmit to the clerk of this court one certified copy of the complete trial court record of these appeals. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court]. Attorney Colucci is note the attorney of record in this matter. The clerk shall amend the docket sheet in docket No. 33421 to indicate that appellant is proceeding in this appeal in proper person. Nos. 33421, 34603. (Docket sheet in Docket No. 33421 corrected-deleted attorney Carmine J. Colucci as counsel for appellant). 99-10686
02/14/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 12. Records filed in Docket No. 33421. Nos. 33421, 34603. Mailed on 02/10/00. 00-02324
02/14/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Nos. 33421, 34603.
06/27/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. fn1[On November 2, 1999, this court consolidated these appeals for disposition.] We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgments of the district court AFFIRMED." fn9[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP02-CY/DA/ML. Nos. 33421/34603. 02-11072
07/23/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-11216
07/23/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/08/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 26, 2002. 02-11216