judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROY GLENN REAY v. THE STATE WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0053)
Case Number:S-07-0053Case Docketed On:03/07/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:ROY GLENN REAY v. THE STATE WYOMING
Full Title:ROY GLENN REAY, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING Appellee (Plaintiff)

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRoy Glenn ReayDiane M. Lozano
Ryan R. Roden
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingTerry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Bruce A. Salzburg
James Michael Causey

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Evidence
Opinion Number:2008 WY 13
Citation:176 P.3d 647

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/07/2007Event - Docketed and indexed.EventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/07/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court.Notice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/07/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter.Notice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/23/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/23/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/07/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/08/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/23/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
07/27/2007Event - Phone Call from counsel for appellee re due date. Called Public Defender's office and requested an amended certificate of service to reflect actual date of serviceEventPhone CallFinal
07/31/2007Event - Phone Call, second call to Public Defender requesting amended certificate of serviceEventPhone CallFinal
07/31/2007Service - Certificate of service (amended)ServiceCertificate of serviceFinal
09/05/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
09/07/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
09/24/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/25/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
09/27/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Information.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/08/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/26/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/26/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/26/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/26/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/28/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 2/27/08 by Candice Ford.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal