judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KINSTON KIRK V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 79-CF-0998
Short Caption:KINSTON KIRK V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F4785-78Filed Date:09/13/1979

Opening Event Date:09/13/1979Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/27/1980Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/09/1981
Argued/Submitted:04/22/1981
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKinston Kirk N
Daniel M. Schember NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901KIRK, KINSTON UNITED STATES
09/13/1979FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/27/1980FiledRecord Completed
02/09/1981FiledBriefing Completed
04/22/1981FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/21/1981FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition