judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WILLIAMS (MICHAEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34714
Short Caption:WILLIAMS (MICHAEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C102615Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:LeavittCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/06/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/24/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/24/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07891
08/24/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt. Sat in district court proceedings.
09/16/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 30 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 99-08741
10/06/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 5. 99-09592
10/06/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/27/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' NNP01A-MS/DA/RR 01-10811
07/24/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-10858
07/24/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/15/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 2, 2001. 01-10858