judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ALLAN DEON WEASE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-187)
Case Number:06-187Case Docketed On:08/17/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Uinta CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:ALLAN DEON WEASE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:ALLAN DEON WEASE, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantAllan Deon WeaseD. Terry Rogers
Donna D. Domonkos
Diane Elizabeth Courselle
Thomas Justice
William Elliott
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Counsel, Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence, Evidence
Opinion Number:2007 WY 176
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/17/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/17/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/17/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/03/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/05/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/13/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/13/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/13/2006Notice-Incoming - Consent and Approval for Thomas Justice and William Elliott to appear on behalf of appellantNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
12/13/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/15/2006Order - Grant - third extension of time no further requests will be consideredOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
02/05/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appealBriefAppellantFinal
03/14/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/15/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/10/2007Motion - Brief - exceed page limitMotionBrief - exceed page limitFinal
05/01/2007Order - Denying motion to exceed page limitationOrderDenyFinal
05/01/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
05/14/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/17/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Leda PojmanNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/18/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
05/21/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/29/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volumes I & II, Original Papers; Volume III, TranscriptsRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/30/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Diane Courselle for appellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
06/07/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal. Confidential documents removed from pleadings and made Volume IV, Confidential FileRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/13/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Diane E. Courselle, Director, DAP for appellant; Leda J. Pojman, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
06/13/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
11/05/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part and remanding. Justice Hill writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/21/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/21/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/21/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/21/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/28/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal