judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RICO D. ANDERSON V. URBAN OUTFITTERS INCORPORATED

Case Information: 10-AA-0757
Short Caption:RICO D. ANDERSON V. URBAN OUTFITTERS INCORPORATEDClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES893-10Filed Date:06/23/2010

Opening Event Date:06/23/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/16/2010
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerRico D. Anderson YPro SeN
RespondentUrban Outfitters IncorporatedNPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/23/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc)
06/23/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
07/02/2010ORDER GRANT PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, and the Clerk shall file the lodged petition for review nunc pro tunc to June 23, 2010. F/ORDERED that Office of Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). FURTHER ORDERED that respondent shall within 30 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). (ETW)
07/02/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO OAH & MILWEE
08/05/2010 On consideration of this court's order of July 2, 2010, directing respondent to identify its counsel within 30 days from the date of the order, and it appearing that respondent has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that respondent shall within 15 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). Failure to comply with this order shall result in respondent being prohibited from filing its brief. (JAC)
11/15/2010 On consideration of the petition for review, and it appearig that a motion for reconsideration was pending when the petition for review was filed and that the agency granted the motion for reconsideration and relief to petitioner, it is ORDERED, sua sponte, that this petition for review is hereby dismissed. (ETW)
11/15/2010DISMISSED
12/16/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/18/2014FiledArchived