judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FULTCHER (ALFRED) VS. STATE C/W 35422 FOR DISPOSITION

Case Information: 34715
Short Caption:FULTCHER (ALFRED) VS. STATE C/W 35422 FOR DISPOSITIONCourt:Supreme Court
Consolidated:34715*, 35422 Related Case(s): 35422 , 36571
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C105084Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/18/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/24/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/24/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07892
10/06/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 34688, 34691, 34693, 34706, 34715, 34716, 34738. 99-09626
01/18/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 5. Mailed on 01/14/00. 00-00756
01/18/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/16/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. Having reviewed the records on appeal, and for the reasons set forth above, we conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER these appeals dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB Nos. 34715, 35422 00-10295
07/12/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-11970
07/12/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/23/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 11, 2000. 00-11970