judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WASHINGTON GAS LIGHT CO.ET AL V. DC DEP'T OF TRANSPORTATION

Case Information: 10-AA-0758
Short Caption:WASHINGTON GAS LIGHT CO.ET AL V. DC DEP'T OF TRANSPORTATIONClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - OAH - Dept of Transportation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DTVM101748-08Filed Date:06/23/2010

Opening Event Date:06/23/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:09/08/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/09/2013

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerWashington Gas Light Co.N
L. Edward FunkYN
Karen B. Pancost YN
PetitionerRobert B. Evans N
L. Edward FunkYN
RespondentD.C. Dep't of TransportationN
Todd S. KimNY
Donna M. MuraskyNY
Andrew Van Brisker NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/23/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
06/23/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
06/23/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD/DEPARTMENT and Todd Kim, Esq.
06/28/2010 On consideration of the petition for review, it is ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (JAC)
08/11/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR STAY
08/16/2010TMC - motion for stay - oppo - reply
08/18/2010RESPONDENT'S OPPOSITION - to petitioner's motion for stay
08/26/2010PETITIONER'S ANSWER/RESPONSE to Opposition to Motion for Stay
08/27/2010 ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY IS DENIED. (KRBRNB) (rm)
09/08/2011FiledRecord Completed
09/08/2011FiledRecord On Appeal w/4/12/10
09/19/2011FiledBriefing Order
10/28/2011FiledBrief (Petitioner Washington Gas Light Company)
10/28/2011FiledAppendix (Petitioner Washington Gas Light Company)
11/23/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent)Granted
12/02/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent) 1/31/2012
01/26/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent)
01/30/2012FiledMotion to Hold Proceedings and Briefing in Abeyance so that Parties can Discuss Settlement. (Respondent)Granted
02/15/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion To Stay Appeal so that Parties can Discuss Settlement. (Respondent)
05/01/2012FiledOrder directing motion & status statement
05/02/2012FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal (Petitioner Washington Gas Light Co., Respondent D.C. Dep't of Transportation)Granted
05/09/2012FiledProceed With Appeal; No Longer On Hold/Stayed
05/09/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion To Dismiss Appeal (Petitioner Washington Gas Light Co., Respondent D.C. Dep't of Transportation)
05/09/2012FiledDismissed
01/09/2013FiledMandate