judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STEVEN A. DeLOGE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-189)
Case Number:06-189Case Docketed On:08/21/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:STEVEN A. DeLOGE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:STEVEN A. DeLOGE, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantSteven A. DeLoge Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 71
Citation:156 P.3d 1004

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/21/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/21/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/21/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/05/2006Brief - Appellant; received copy of designation of record on appealBriefAppellantFinal
10/09/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/10/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/29/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/30/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/11/2006Motion - Other opposition to further delay of briefing schedule - no action necessary at this timeMotionOtherFinal
01/11/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of designation of record on appeal and copy of brief on diskBriefAppelleeFinal
01/17/2007Motion - Other, appellant's motion for copy of designated record and additional time to file reply briefMotionOtherFinal
01/18/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
01/29/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
01/29/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
01/29/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/06/2007Correspondence - Incoming from appellant regarding his reply brief, respondedCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
02/06/2007Order - Denying copy of designated record and order denying motion for additional time to file reply briefOrderDenyFinal
02/08/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Original Record prior Supreme Court records dockets 01-41, and 04-85 (5 bound volumes, transcripts, manila folders & confidential folder)RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/27/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part. Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/10/2007Petition - RehearingPetitionRehearingFinal
05/10/2007Brief - Other. Brief in support of petition for rehearing.BriefOtherFinal
05/23/2007Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
05/23/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/23/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/23/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/29/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal