Case: 01-05-00499-CR
01-05-00499-CR
05/12/2005
Capital murder
Cecil Henderson
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
06/26/2017 | Telephone inquiry to or from the court | | |||||
05/19/2017 | Letter received | | |||||
03/14/2016 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
03/10/2016 | Letter received | | |||||
10/16/2015 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
10/09/2015 | Letter received | | |||||
03/25/2008 | Exhibits returned to the district or county clerk | | |||||
09/21/2006 | Mandate acknowledged by trial court clerk |
| |||||
09/21/2006 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil |
| |||||
07/14/2006 | Motion for Rehearing Due | | |||||
06/29/2006 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirm TC judgment |
| ||||
06/08/2006 | Exhibits filed | | |||||
05/09/2006 | Exhibits due | | |||||
05/02/2006 | Order entered | Issue sua sponte order | | ||||
05/02/2006 | Submitted | | |||||
04/13/2006 | Appellant's reply brief due. | | |||||
04/11/2006 | Case set for submission no oral argument | | |||||
04/05/2006 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | | ||||
03/24/2006 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
03/24/2006 | Brief filed-oral argument has been waived |
| |||||
03/24/2006 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |||||
03/20/2006 | Brief Due | | |||||
02/28/2006 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | | ||||
02/17/2006 | Brief Due | | |||||
02/16/2006 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |||||
01/26/2006 | Brief Due | | |||||
01/18/2006 | Brief filed-oral argument has been requested |
| |||||
12/27/2005 | Order entered | Grant motion | | ||||
12/27/2005 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | | ||||
12/21/2005 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |||||
12/21/2005 | Brief Due | | |||||
11/29/2005 | Extension Granted - No Further Extensions Of Time Will be Entertained | Grant motion | | ||||
11/21/2005 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |||||
11/21/2005 | Brief Due | | |||||
10/31/2005 | Extension Granted - No Further Extensions Of Time Will be Entertained | Grant motion | | ||||
10/20/2005 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |||||
10/20/2005 | Brief Due | | |||||
09/27/2005 | Order entered | Issue sua sponte order | | ||||
09/20/2005 | Reporter's record filed (statement of facts) | | |||||
09/07/2005 | Reporters Record Due (Statement of Facts) | | |||||
07/25/2005 | Request for time to file reporter's record disposed | Grant motion | | ||||
07/18/2005 | Request filed for additional time to file reporter's record | | |||||
07/09/2005 | Record due | | |||||
06/29/2005 | Clerk's record filed (transcript) | | |||||
06/29/2005 | Supplemental Clerks Record Filed | | |||||
05/12/2005 | NOA received in COA from trial court. | | |||||
05/10/2005 | Date of Sentence in Criminal Case | | |||||
05/10/2005 | Notice of appeal filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/21/2006 | Case Stored | Case stored |
09/21/2006 | Retention | Criminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Charles A. Rosenthal, Jr. Donald W. Rogers Jr. |
Henderson, Cecil | Appellant | Cecil Henderson Richard Edward Wheelan |
Trial Court Information
208th District Court
Harris
Honorable Hon. Denise Collins
932475
Life