judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BRANDY FAY PENDLETON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-129)
Case Number:06-129Case Docketed On:06/09/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Uinta CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:BRANDY FAY PENDLETON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:BRANDY FAY PENDLETON, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBrandy Faye PendletonD. Terry Rogers
Donna D. Domonkos
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Geoffrey Gunnerson
Eric Alan Johnson
Brian J. Hunter

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law, Evidence, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 36
Citation:180 P.3d 212

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/07/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/09/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/09/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/26/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/27/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/08/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/11/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/23/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/24/2006Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
11/20/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/27/2006Order - Grant - extension of time, fourth extensionOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/27/2006Brief - Appellant; received copy of designation of record on appeal and copy of brief on disk on 01/02/07BriefAppellantFinal
02/07/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/08/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/28/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/29/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/14/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy on disk and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
05/14/2007Notice-Incoming - Consent and Approval - Geoffrey L. Gunnerson, Student Director, PAP on behalf of appellee.Notice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
06/01/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/08/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, six volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volumes II - V, Transcripts; Volume VI, Confidential FileRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/06/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/17/2007Notice-Incoming - Consent and Approval for Brian J. Hunter to appear on behalf of appelleeNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
07/17/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting. Brian J. Hunter will present argument on behalf of appelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/31/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Donna Domonkos for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/14/2007Event - Oral argument presented to full Court. Donna D. Domonkos, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel appearing on behalf of the appellant and D. Michael Pauling, Senior Assistant Attorney General, Eric Alan Johnson, Director, Prosecution Assistance Program, Brian J. Hunter, Student Intern appearing on behalf of the appellee, argument by Mr. Hunter.EventOral argument presentedFinal
08/14/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/31/2008Notice-Internal - Other - Changed spelling of appellant's middle name to reflect correction made in trial courtNotice-InternalOtherFinal
04/02/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/18/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/18/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/18/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/23/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 4/21/08 by Laura Tueller.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal