judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JUDY G. MINES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 81-CF-0737
Short Caption:JUDY G. MINES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6902-80Filed Date:05/26/1981

Opening Event Date:05/26/1981Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/26/1981Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/22/1983
Argued/Submitted:04/28/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJudy G. Mines N
Jeffrey C. Hines NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MINES, JUDY G. UNITED STATES
05/26/1981FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/26/1981FiledRecord Completed
02/22/1983FiledBriefing Completed
04/28/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/20/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition