judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CLARKE (ROBERT) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36203
Short Caption:CLARKE (ROBERT) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/31/2000Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ. Petition for Review; Motion; Brief; request to waive filing fee. 00-09201
05/31/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
06/20/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Service and Directing Answer. Petitioner shall have 20 days from the date of this order to serve the petition upon respondent and provide proof of such service to this court. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of service of the petition within which to file an answer. fn1[We direct the clerk of this court to amend the caption on this court's docket so that it is consistent with the caption on this order.] 00-10533
10/12/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On June 20, 2000, this court directed petitioner to serve a copy of the petition upon the respondent. In response to this order, petitioner submitted a "Motion to Stay Order," requesting that this court provide him with copies of his petition and other papers, as Lake's Crossing would not provide him with free copies and he counld not afford to pay for the copies. We note that petitioner was able to serve a copy of another petition filed with thiscourt. We therefore deny petitioner's "Motion to stay Order." Petitioner shall have 20 days from the date of this order to serve the petition upon respondent and to provide proof of such service to this court. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of service of the petition to file an answer. We caution petitioner that failure to timely serve the petition and provide proof of service to this court in accordance with this order will result in the dismissal of this petition. fn1[Although petitioner was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person documents received from petitioner.] 00-18043
01/03/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Petition. Order Dismissing Petition for Writ of Mandamus. On November 16, 2000, petitioner submitted a document stating his intention to voluntarily withdraw this proper person petition for a writ of mandamus. " . . . we dismiss the petition." fn1[Although appellant (petitioner) was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person documents received from appellant (petitioner).] SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB 01-00126
01/03/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No notice in lieu of remittitur issued.