judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KIMBERLY K. RAGSDALE v. HARTFORD UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Heading (06-130)
Case Number:06-130Case Docketed On:06/09/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Insurance Code (Title 26)
Short Title:KIMBERLY K. RAGSDALE v. HARTFORD UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Full Title:KIMBERLY K. RAGSDALE, Appellant (Cross-Claim Plaintiff), v. HARTFORD UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY, Appellee (Cross-Claim Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKimberly K. RagsdaleRonald E. Triggs
AppelleeHartford Underwriters Insurance CompanyScott P. Klosterman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 163
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/09/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/09/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/09/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/09/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/21/2006Motion - Supplement the record and motion for extension of time to file briefMotionSupplement the recordFinal
06/27/2006Response/Objection - Motion to supplement the record and for extension of time to file briefResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
07/05/2006Response/Objection - Reply to appellee's responseResponse/ObjectionReplyFinal
07/11/2006Order - Denying motion to supplement the record on appeal and denying motion for extension of time to file briefOrderDenyFinal
07/24/2006Brief - Appellant; received copy of designation of record on appealBriefAppellantFinal
09/11/2006Brief - Appellee; received copy of designation of record on appeal and copy of brief on diskBriefAppelleeFinal
09/26/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/26/2006Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
10/03/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/05/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, five volumes. Volumes I - IV, Original Papers; Volume V, TranscriptsRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/05/2006Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
11/15/2006Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Ronald E. Triggs for appellant; Scott P. Klosterman for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
11/15/2006Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
10/17/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order dismissing. Justice Golden writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/02/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/02/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/02/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/02/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/08/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 11/7/07 by Rosemary Montez.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal