judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MCCLINNAHAN, JAMES F. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 81-CF-0753
Short Caption:MCCLINNAHAN, JAMES F. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6504-79Filed Date:06/10/1981

Opening Event Date:06/10/1981Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/28/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/14/1983
Argued/Submitted:12/08/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Craig N. MooreYY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MCCLINNAHAN, JAMES F. UNITED STATES
06/10/1981FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/28/1982FiledRecord Completed
09/14/1983FiledBriefing Completed
12/08/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/09/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition