Case: 14-94-00246-CR
14-94-00246-CR
03/17/1994
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
McGowen, Joseph Kenton
State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/24/2001 | Case stored | | |
05/15/2001 | Mandate Issued | | |
05/15/2001 | Mandate Issued | | |
05/01/2001 | Mandate due to be issued | | |
05/01/2001 | Record RETURNED from Higher Court | | |
04/04/2001 | Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSED | REFUSED | |
09/29/2000 | Record Sent | | |
09/20/2000 | Petition for discretionary review due | | |
09/11/2000 | Petition for Discretionary Review FILED | | |
08/22/2000 | Extend time to file PDR DISPOSED | GRANTED | |
08/21/2000 | Petition for discretionary review due | | |
08/17/2000 | Petition for Discretionary Review FILED | | |
08/04/2000 | Motion for rehearing DUE | | |
08/04/2000 | No motion for rehearing FILED | | |
07/20/2000 | Mtn.for en banc consideration DISPOSED-APE,ANT | DENIED | |
07/20/2000 | Opinion issued | REVERSED AND REMANDED | |
07/20/2000 | Opinion Withdrawn | | |
07/20/2000 | Substitute Opinion | | |
07/20/2000 | Opinion issued | REVERSED AND REMANDED | |
03/03/2000 | Response due | | |
03/03/2000 | Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA | | |
02/18/2000 | Motion for rehearing DUE | | |
02/16/2000 | Mtn.for en banc consideration FILED-ANT,APE | | |
02/03/2000 | Opinion issued | REVERSED AND REMANDED | |
02/02/2000 | Submitted | | |
02/16/1999 | Reply brief DUE | | |
02/16/1999 | Reply Brief Filed | | |
01/28/1999 | Misc motion DISPOSED | GRANTED | |
01/22/1999 | Misc Motion filed | | |
01/15/1999 | State's brief DUE | | |
01/13/1999 | Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
01/13/1999 | Case ready to be set | | |
12/21/1998 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |
12/16/1998 | Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
12/07/1998 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |
11/25/1998 | Misc motion DISPOSED | DENIED | |
11/20/1998 | RECORD RETURNED ON REMAND TO COURT OF APPEALS | | |
11/20/1998 | Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSED | REVERSED AND REMANDED | |
11/20/1998 | Record RETURNED from Higher Court | | |
11/19/1998 | Misc Motion filed | | |
11/05/1998 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
10/29/1998 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
06/05/1997 | Exhibits returned to the district or county clerk | | |
05/12/1997 | Petition for discretionary review due | | |
05/08/1997 | Petition for Discretionary Review FILED | | |
04/25/1997 | Motion for rehearing DUE | | |
04/25/1997 | No motion for rehearing FILED | | |
04/10/1997 | Opinion issued | REVERSED AND REMANDED | |
04/10/1997 | Opinion Withdrawn | | |
04/10/1997 | Substitute Opinion | | |
04/03/1997 | Opinion issued | REVERSED AND REMANDED | |
05/02/1996 | Submitted | | |
05/02/1996 | Submission | | |
05/02/1996 | Submitted | | |
04/16/1996 | Submission | | |
04/18/1995 | Exhibits FILED | | |
04/17/1995 | Supplemental transcript DUE | | |
04/06/1995 | Mtn.supplement record DISPOSED-ANT,APE,PRO SE,STA | GRANTED | |
04/06/1995 | Order Entered | | |
03/27/1995 | State's brief DUE | | |
03/24/1995 | Mtn.to supplement record FILED-ANT,APE,PRO SE,STA | | |
03/20/1995 | Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
03/20/1995 | Case ready to be set | | |
03/20/1995 | Case ready to be set | | |
03/02/1995 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
02/24/1995 | State's brief DUE | | |
02/23/1995 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
01/27/1995 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |
01/27/1995 | Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
12/29/1994 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
12/28/1994 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |
12/21/1994 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
12/08/1994 | Mtn.supplement record DISPOSED-ANT,APE,PRO SE,STA | DENIED | |
11/29/1994 | Mtn.to supplement record FILED-ANT,APE,PRO SE,STA | | |
11/29/1994 | Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP | | |
10/27/1994 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
10/27/1994 | Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STA | GRANTED | |
10/17/1994 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |
10/17/1994 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |
10/14/1994 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
10/14/1994 | Mtn.to supplement record FILED-ANT,APE,PRO SE,STA | | |
09/15/1994 | Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP | | |
08/18/1994 | Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP | GRANTED | |
08/09/1994 | Extend time to file statement of facts FILED | | |
08/09/1994 | Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP | | |
07/14/1994 | Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP | GRANTED | |
07/12/1994 | No description available. | | |
07/08/1994 | Extend time to file statement of facts FILED | | |
07/08/1994 | Transcript FILED | | |
04/08/1994 | Motion for new trial FILED | | |
03/17/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
03/11/1994 | Date of Sentence | | |
03/11/1994 | Notice of Appeal FILED - APP | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/15/2001 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | William J. Delmore, III |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Criminal - Appellant | George McCall Secrest, Jr. |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Criminal - State of Texas | |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Criminal - State of Texas | |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Criminal - Appellant | Clinton F. Greenwood |
Trial Court Information
232nd District Court
Harris
647853
15 yrs. TDC