judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SHARTZER VS. SHARTZER

Case Information: 34602
Short Caption:SHARTZER VS. SHARTZERCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D219421Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/10/1999 / Combs, E.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/28/2000How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/02/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Mark A. Jenkin-check no. 4299.
08/02/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07072
08/10/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: March 19, 1999. To Court Reporter: Department H. 99-07353
08/10/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: E. Leslie Combs, Jr. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/17/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. 99-08825
09/27/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-09222
09/27/1999MotionFiled Stipulation. 99-09223
11/05/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Per NRAP 16(g), the settlement judge indicates that the parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant shall have 15 days to file the docketing statement. Deadlines for requesting/preparing transcripts and briefing shall remain suspended pending a jurisdictional review of this appeal and further order of this court. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 99-10896
11/19/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-11547
12/06/1999Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a), and file a new transcript request form; 120 days to file opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 99-12213
12/21/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Amended Request for Transcript of Proceedings and Notice of Delivery of Transcript to Opposing Counsel. Transcripts requested: 3/19/99. To Court Reporter: Deborah S. Casper. 99-12986
01/03/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Change of Address. 00-00032
01/10/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. March 19, 1999 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Deborah Casper. 00-00397
01/13/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Amended Notice of Change of Address. 00-00599
04/04/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 4/3/00. 00-05399
04/04/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 00-05400
05/08/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Las Vegas Drop Box 5/4/00. 00-07473
05/08/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 00-07475
06/07/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Las Vegas Drop Box 6/5/00. 00-09583
08/28/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein. 00-15040
08/28/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/17/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP01A-MS/DA/RR 01-08204
06/12/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-08417
06/12/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/05/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 19, 2001. 01-08417