judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CHARLES HIGH, JR. V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 79-CF-0776
Short Caption:CHARLES HIGH, JR. V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:07/14/1979

Opening Event Date:07/14/1979Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/07/1979Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/12/1980
Argued/Submitted:09/03/1980
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCharles High, Jr.N
Leroy Nesbitt NN
AppellantCharles High, Jr.N
Thomas K. Clancy NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HIGH JR., CHARLES UNITED STATES
07/14/1979FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/07/1979FiledRecord Completed
06/12/1980FiledBriefing Completed
09/03/1980FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/23/1980FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition