judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Combined Independent Agencies, Inc. v. Mustang Trading, Inc., d/b/a West End Cab Company

Case: 05-94-00463-CV
05-94-00463-CV
03/17/1994
Contract
Combined Independent Agencies, Inc.
Mustang Trading, Inc., d/b/a West End Cab Company
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
No briefs.
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
04/20/1994Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsCase Transferred to Another Court of Appeals
04/20/1994Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsCase Transferred to Another Court of Appeals
03/30/1994Letter Filed
03/25/1994MattConv
03/17/1994Exhibits Filed
03/17/1994Statement of Facts Filed
03/17/1994Transcript Filed
03/17/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
02/14/1994Appeal Bond Filed
11/19/1993Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/20/1994Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
95th District Court
Dallas
Honorable Billy F Coker
92-9367-D