Case: 08-94-00062-CV
08-94-00062-CV
03/17/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Heritage Resources, Inc.
Nationsbank, Co. - Trustee Under the Will of David B. Trammel, Deceased, et al.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
12/02/2016 | Case sent to State Archives | | |
11/01/1995 | Decision from Supreme Court or CCA | Motion or Writ Granted | |
05/25/1995 | Case Forwarded to Higher Court | | |
05/17/1995 | Fee paid | | |
05/15/1995 | Envelope Filed, showing postmark date | | |
05/15/1995 | Fee paid | | |
05/15/1995 | Application for Writ of Error | | |
04/20/1995 | Fee paid | | |
04/12/1995 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Overruled | |
04/03/1995 | Fee paid | | |
04/03/1995 | Fee paid | | |
03/30/1995 | Fee paid | | |
03/27/1995 | Fee paid | | |
03/24/1995 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |
03/09/1995 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
03/09/1995 | Payment of fee due requested | | |
03/09/1995 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
11/03/1994 | Submitted | | |
11/03/1994 | Submission | | |
11/03/1994 | Submitted | | |
10/06/1994 | Submission | | |
09/14/1994 | Miscellaneous filing | | |
07/08/1994 | Brief Filed | | |
07/08/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |
07/08/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |
06/22/1994 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/06/1994 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
05/31/1994 | Brief Filed | | |
05/31/1994 | Filed Ltr re req. for oral argument | | |
05/02/1994 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |
03/30/1994 | Motion for Extension Statement of Facts Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/28/1994 | Fee paid | | |
03/21/1994 | Payment of fee due requested | | |
03/21/1994 | Transcript Filed | | |
03/17/1994 | Fee paid | | |
03/17/1994 | Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed | | |
03/17/1994 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
03/17/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
12/02/2016 | Case Stored | Case archived |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
NATIONSBANK, CO. - TRUSTEE UND | Appellee | Hon. Ben A. Douglas Hon. Robert Scogin Hon. Rick K. Disney |
HERITAGE RESOURCES, INC. | Appellant | Hon. John R. Woodward |
Trial Court Information
109th District Court
Winkler
Honorable James L. Rex
12,120