Case: 13-94-00140-CV
13-94-00140-CV
03/17/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Rose, Larry L.
First American Title Insurance Company of Texas and Brian Scott Carr
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
12/08/1995 | Cite for opinions | | |
10/10/1995 | Mandate Issued | | |
08/24/1995 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
05/10/1995 | Submitted | | |
05/10/1995 | Submission | | |
04/28/1995 | Supplemental citation | | |
04/11/1995 | Submission | | |
03/23/1995 | Panel change on case on SMIS or SMIT | | |
02/02/1995 | Entry of Judge Selection for Case. | | |
01/18/1995 | Submission | | |
12/19/1994 | Authorities filed | | |
05/26/1994 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Dismissed | |
05/17/1994 | Brief Filed | | |
05/17/1994 | Oral argument requested | | |
05/17/1994 | Certificate Filed | | |
05/16/1994 | Certificate Filed | | |
05/12/1994 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
05/06/1994 | Additional copies of motion for extension of time | | |
05/05/1994 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
04/26/1994 | STATEMENT OF FACTS FILED | | |
04/26/1994 | Supplemental Authorities Filed | | |
04/26/1994 | Document Received | | |
04/26/1994 | Miscellaneous Motion | | |
04/26/1994 | Supplemental Authorities | | |
04/22/1994 | Statement Filed | | |
04/19/1994 | Brief Filed | | |
04/19/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |
04/19/1994 | Oral argument requested | | |
03/25/1994 | Filing Fee Paid | | |
03/25/1994 | Statement Filed | | |
03/17/1994 | Transcript Filed | | |
03/17/1994 | Transcript Received | | |
03/17/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/10/1995 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
First American Title Insurance | Appellee | Hon. Stephen C. Haynes William M. Mills Lisa D. Powell |
Rose, Larry L. | Appellant | R. Bruce Phillips Hon. Richard D. Schell |
Trial Court Information
370th District Court
Hidalgo
Honorable Fidencio M. Guerra
C-5019-92-G(1)