judyrecords
search tips
700 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals Record

Anderson, Terry v. Kent, Hon. Cynthia

Case: 12-94-00077-CV
12-94-00077-CV
03/17/1994
Mandamus
Anderson, Terry
Kent, Hon. Cynthia
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/18/2006Case has been destroyed/Records Retention Action
05/12/1994
04/12/1994Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
04/12/1994Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
03/30/1994motion for rehearing filed
03/25/1994Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
03/25/1994Order EnteredOtherwise Disposed
03/25/1994Motion for Leave to File DisposedOverruled
03/25/1994Case ready to be set
03/25/1994Submission
03/25/1994Submitted
03/17/1994Motion for Leave to File
03/17/1994No Description Available.
03/17/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/18/2006Case DestroyedCase Destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown UserRespondentJudge Cynthia S. Kent
Anderson, TerryRelatorTerry Weldon Anderson
Trial Court Information
114th District Court
Honorable Cynthia S. Kent
13,786-93