Case: 12-94-00076-CV
12-94-00076-CV
03/17/1994
Automobile Personal Injury
Robison, Arthur J.
Krumm, Teri, Individually and as Representative of the Estate of Linda West, and Christopher Woodard
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
02/18/2006 | Case has been destroyed/Records Retention Action | | |
09/19/1994 | | ||
09/19/1994 | Case stored | | |
09/14/1994 | Mandate Issued | | |
09/14/1994 | No Description Available. | | |
08/25/1994 | | ||
08/10/1994 | | ||
07/26/1994 | Notice of judgment or order entered by Court | | |
07/26/1994 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | |
07/26/1994 | Motion to dismiss disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/26/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |
07/26/1994 | Submission | | |
07/26/1994 | Submitted | | |
07/18/1994 | Motion to Dismiss Appeal Filed | | |
06/22/1994 | Brief Filed | | |
06/02/1994 | Notice Filed | | |
05/23/1994 | No Description Available. | | |
05/23/1994 | No Description Available. | | |
04/20/1994 | | ||
04/08/1994 | Mot for Ext Transcript Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/08/1994 | Motion or Writ Granted | | |
04/08/1994 | Notice of judgment or order entered by Court | | |
03/23/1994 | Affidavit Filed. | | |
03/21/1994 | Mot - Ext. to File Transcript | | |
03/18/1994 | Affidavit Filed. | | |
03/17/1994 | motion for extension of time to file sfacts | | |
03/17/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
02/14/1994 | Surety Bond Filed | | |
12/17/1993 | Motion For New Trial filed in trial court | | |
11/19/1993 | Judgment from the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/18/2006 | Case Destroyed | Case Destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Krumm, Teri Individually And | Appellee | Mr. M. Keith Dollahite Mr. Christopher J. Ewert Mr. Bill Clark |
Robison, Arthur J. | Appellant | Mr. Byron L. Falk Ms Janie E James |
Trial Court Information
3rd District Court
Honorable Sam B. Bournias
91-169