Case: 94-0271
94-0271
03/18/1994
App Writ of Error
ROBERT J. WILSON
THE STATE BAR OF TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/07/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
05/12/1994 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
03/30/1994 | Reply to Response | Respondent | | |
03/18/1994 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/07/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
05/26/1994 | Record returned to Court of Appeals | Mo/Re Overruled | | |
05/25/1994 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | Overruled | | |
05/12/1994 | Conditional motion for rehearing | No description available. | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date. | |
05/12/1994 | Motion for Rehearing | | | |
05/12/1994 | Motion for Rehearing forwarded | record remain in clerks office | | |
04/28/1994 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Denied | | |
03/31/1994 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
03/30/1994 | Reply to Response | | | |
03/18/1994 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
05/26/1994 | Case Stored | Case stored. | Mo/Re Overruled |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
WILSON, ROBERT J. | Petitioner | Mr. Robert J. Wilson |
THE STATE BAR OF TEXAS | Respondent | Ms. Linda Acevedo Ms. Mary F. Klapperich |
Court of Appeals Information:
02-93-00214-CV
Dismissed WOJ
RULE 90, 01-11-94
2nd Court of Appeals
Honorable HAL M. LATTIMORE
Trial Court Information
17th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Fred W. Davis
17-128555-90