Case: 14-94-00248-CR
14-94-00248-CR
03/17/1994
Robbery
Campbell, Wayne Ohara
The State of Texas
No
2nd Court of Appeals
10/18/1996
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
10/18/1996 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | GRANTED | |
10/18/1996 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | GRANTED | |
10/18/1996 | Mandate Issued | | |
10/18/1996 | Case ready to be set | | |
05/09/1996 | Motion to strike DISPOSED - ANT, APE, STA | DENIED | |
05/02/1996 | Motion to strike DISPOSED - ANT, APE, STA | DENIED | |
05/01/1996 | Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA | | |
04/25/1996 | Motion to Strike FILED - ANT, APE, STA | | |
04/04/1996 | Amended brief FILED - ANT,APE,APP,STA, | | |
04/04/1996 | Mtn.Lv.file amend.brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP | GRANTED | |
03/25/1996 | Amended brief RECEIVED - ANT,APE,APP,STA | | |
03/25/1996 | Mtn.Lv.FILE amended brief - ANT,APE,APP | | |
10/26/1995 | Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
10/26/1995 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
10/23/1995 | Brf.RECD.ARGU.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA | | |
10/23/1995 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
10/12/1995 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
10/03/1995 | Past due brief | | |
09/27/1995 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |
09/07/1995 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
08/30/1995 | Past due brief | | |
08/29/1995 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
08/27/1995 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |
07/20/1995 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
07/11/1995 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |
07/11/1995 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
06/19/1995 | Case ready to be set | | |
06/19/1995 | State's brief DUE | | |
06/13/1995 | Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
05/18/1995 | Criminal appeal reinstated | | |
05/18/1995 | Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STA | GRANTED | |
05/12/1995 | Hearing Record FILED | | |
04/13/1995 | Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STA | GRANTED | |
04/13/1995 | Order Entered | | |
04/11/1995 | Petition for discretionary review due | | |
04/06/1995 | Ext.time file Mtn.for Rehear.DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP | GRANTED | |
04/06/1995 | Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA | | |
04/03/1995 | Misc Motion filed | | |
04/03/1995 | Motion for rehearing RECEIVED - ANT,APE,PRO SE | | |
03/30/1995 | Ext.time file Mtn.for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,APP | | |
03/27/1995 | Motion for rehearing DUE | | |
03/27/1995 | No motion for rehearing FILED | | |
03/16/1995 | Ext.time file Mtn.for Rehear.DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP | GRANTED | |
03/10/1995 | Ext.time file Mtn.for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,APP | | |
03/10/1995 | Motion for rehearing DUE | | |
02/16/1995 | Ext.time file Mtn.for Rehear.DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP | GRANTED | |
02/10/1995 | Ext.time file Mtn.for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,APP | | |
01/27/1995 | State's brief DUE | | |
01/26/1995 | Mtn.Lv. file out-of-time appeal DISPOSED - APP | DENIED | |
01/26/1995 | Opinion issued | DISMISSED | |
01/25/1995 | Submitted | | |
01/25/1995 | Submission | | |
01/25/1995 | Submitted | | |
01/12/1995 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |
12/30/1994 | Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
12/30/1994 | Mtn.Lv. file out-of-time appeal FILED - APP | | |
12/29/1994 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
12/12/1994 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |
12/12/1994 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
11/17/1994 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
11/11/1994 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |
11/10/1994 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
10/06/1994 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | DENIED | |
09/28/1994 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
09/22/1994 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
09/15/1994 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
09/13/1994 | Past due brief | | |
08/11/1994 | Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP | | |
07/28/1994 | Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP | GRANTED | |
07/19/1994 | Extend time to file statement of facts FILED | | |
07/11/1994 | No description available. | | |
06/16/1994 | Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP | GRANTED | |
06/08/1994 | Extend time to file statement of facts FILED | | |
05/25/1994 | No description available. | | |
04/21/1994 | Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP | GRANTED | |
04/21/1994 | Extend time to file transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE | GRANTED | |
04/21/1994 | Transcript FILED | | |
04/13/1994 | Extend time to file statement of facts FILED | | |
04/13/1994 | Extend time to file transcript FILED-ANT,APE | | |
03/22/1994 | Transcript received only; mtn. pending | | |
03/17/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
03/11/1994 | Notice of Appeal FILED - APP | | |
01/14/1994 | Motion for new trial FILED | | |
11/01/1993 | Date of Sentence | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/18/1996 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Criminal - State of Texas | |
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | William J. Delmore, III |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Criminal - Appellant | Evelyn Graham Rodriguez |
Trial Court Information
185th District Court
Harris
Honorable CARL WALKER
648467
25 yrs. TDC