Case: 14-94-00247-CR
14-94-00247-CR
03/17/1994
Assault & battery
Holmes, Matthew
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
08/20/1996 | Case stored | | |
08/12/1996 | Mandate due to be issued | | |
08/12/1996 | Mandate Issued | | |
08/12/1996 | Mandate Issued | | |
07/29/1996 | Petition for discretionary review due | | |
07/12/1996 | Motion for rehearing DUE | | |
06/27/1996 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED | |
06/27/1996 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED | |
05/01/1996 | Submitted | | |
05/01/1996 | Submission | | |
05/01/1996 | Submitted | | |
03/21/1996 | Submission | | |
05/18/1995 | Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
05/18/1995 | Case ready to be set | | |
05/18/1995 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
05/18/1995 | Case ready to be set | | |
05/12/1995 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
05/05/1995 | State's brief DUE | | |
03/30/1995 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
03/24/1995 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
03/17/1995 | State's brief DUE | | |
02/23/1995 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
02/17/1995 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
02/17/1995 | State's brief DUE | | |
01/26/1995 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
01/20/1995 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
01/17/1995 | State's brief DUE | | |
01/13/1995 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |
12/20/1994 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |
12/20/1994 | Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
12/08/1994 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
11/29/1994 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
11/10/1994 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
11/03/1994 | Past due brief | | |
11/02/1994 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |
11/02/1994 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
10/13/1994 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
10/04/1994 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
10/03/1994 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |
09/01/1994 | Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP | GRANTED | |
09/01/1994 | Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP | | |
08/29/1994 | Extend time to file statement of facts FILED | | |
08/29/1994 | Statement of Facts RECEIVED - ANT, APP, REL | | |
08/16/1994 | No description available. | | |
06/30/1994 | Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP | GRANTED | |
06/22/1994 | Extend time to file statement of facts FILED | | |
06/16/1994 | No description available. | | |
06/14/1994 | Transcript FILED | | |
03/17/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
03/14/1994 | Motion for new trial FILED | | |
03/14/1994 | Notice of Appeal FILED - APP | | |
02/15/1994 | Date of Sentence | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/18/2017 | Case Stored | Case archived |
08/12/1996 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Criminal - State of Texas | |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Criminal - Appellant | Brian D. Coyne |
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | Julie Klibert |
Trial Court Information
177th District Court
Harris
Honorable ROBERT MONTGOMERY
665053
45 yrs. TDC