Case: 02-99-00234-CV
02-99-00234-CV
07/15/1999
Medical malpractice
Bobby Hart and Carolyn Hart
Dr. Robert Lee Wright and Huguley Memorial Medical Center a/k/a Huguley Health System, a/k/a Adventist Health System/Sunbelt, Inc.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
06/27/2001 | Mandate Issued | | |
06/26/2001 | Case Returned from Higher Court | | |
06/22/2001 | Order Entered | | |
05/10/2001 | Petition for Review Filed in Supreme Court | Motion or Writ Denied | |
12/07/2000 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/25/2000 | Case Forwarded to Higher Court | | |
10/20/2000 | Other Document Received | | |
09/07/2000 | Other Document Received | | |
08/03/2000 | Petition for Review Filed in Supreme Court | | |
07/14/2000 | Mo for Ext to File Petition for Discretionary Review | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/06/2000 | Mo for Ext to File Petition for Discretionary Review | | |
05/18/2000 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
05/05/2000 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |
04/20/2000 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
04/20/2000 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
03/01/2000 | Submitted | | |
01/24/2000 | Submission | | |
01/24/2000 | Case ready to be set | | |
01/24/2000 | Brief Filed | | |
12/29/1999 | Brief Filed | | |
11/29/1999 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
11/23/1999 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |
10/27/1999 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |
10/01/1999 | Letter | | |
09/29/1999 | Order Entered | | |
09/29/1999 | Other Document Received | | |
09/24/1999 | Letter | | |
09/23/1999 | Other Document Received | | |
08/26/1999 | Request for Extension of Clerk's Record | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/25/1999 | Received Clerk's Affidavit or Letter | | |
08/23/1999 | Clerk's Record Not Received | | |
08/16/1999 | Letter | | |
08/12/1999 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |
08/10/1999 | Letter | | |
08/09/1999 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |
08/04/1999 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |
07/15/1999 | Appellant's Notice of Appeal | | |
07/15/1999 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/27/2001 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Allen, Jack | Appellee | |
Crouch, R.n., Adair | Appellee | |
Hart, Carolyn | Appellant | Danny Duane Pitzer |
Hart, Bobby | Appellant | Danny Duane Pitzer |
Robinette, Kelley | Appellee | |
Huguley Memorial Medical | Appellee | Jennifer M. Andrews |
Wright, Robert Lee | Appellee | J. Brooks Harrington |
Trial Court Information
96th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Jeff Walker
96-172317-98