Case: 02-94-00099-CR
02-94-00099-CR
03/17/1994
Other Drug Possession or Delivery
Nelson, Willie James
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/09/1996 | Mandate Issued | | |
11/22/1995 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA | Refused | |
09/22/1995 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA | | |
09/07/1995 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
06/13/1995 | Submitted | | |
06/13/1995 | Submission | | |
06/02/1995 | Letter | | |
06/01/1995 | Letter | | |
01/04/1995 | No Description Available. | | |
09/16/1994 | Brief Filed | | |
09/16/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |
07/14/1994 | Brief Filed | | |
07/08/1994 | Criminal record or relator's record and/or exhibits | | |
07/08/1994 | Submission | | |
03/17/1994 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
03/17/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/09/1996 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Unknown User | Criminal - State of Texas | Betty Marshall |
Nelson, Willie James | Criminal - Appellant | Cindy Stormer |
Trial Court Information
213th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Robert K. Gill
0529741D
90 YRS IDTDCJ