Case: 01-99-00794-CR
01-99-00794-CR
07/15/1999
Other Drug Possession
Evans, Christopher Dennard
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
11/06/2000 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
11/06/2000 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
10/12/2000 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | |
10/12/2000 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | |
10/11/2000 | Submitted | | |
10/11/2000 | Submission | | |
10/11/2000 | Submitted | | |
09/27/2000 | Case reinstated | | |
09/27/2000 | Record of Abatement Hearing filed | | |
09/27/2000 | Case reinstated | | |
07/10/2000 | Abatement Hearing Record Due | | |
05/11/2000 | Order entered | Abate case | |
05/11/2000 | Order entered | Abate case | |
05/10/2000 | Submitted | | |
05/10/2000 | Submission | | |
05/10/2000 | Submitted | | |
03/23/2000 | Brief past due notice | | |
02/24/2000 | Brief Due | | |
01/25/2000 | Reporter's record filed (statement of facts) | | |
10/01/1999 | Order entered | Otherwise disposed | |
09/13/1999 | Docketing statement filed | | |
08/31/1999 | Reporter's Record Past Due Notice sent | | |
08/09/1999 | Clerk's record filed (transcript) | | |
08/07/1999 | Record due | | |
07/15/1999 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
06/10/1999 | Notice of Appeal filed - record due 120 days | | |
04/29/1999 | Motion for new trial filed in trial court (civil Tex. R. Civ. P. 329b, criminal TRAP 21) | | |
04/09/1999 | Date of Sentence in Criminal Case | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/06/2000 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | Calvin A. Hartmann John B. Holmes |
COORDINATOR, TRIAL COURT | Trial court coordinator | Hon. Caprice Cosper |
District Clerk, District | District clerk | |
JUDGE, TRIAL | Trial court judge | Jimmy James |
REPORTER, COURT | Court reporter | Georgetta E. Mattox Linda Hacker |
EVANS, CHRISTOPHER DENNARD | Criminal - Appellant | Ralphaell V. Wilkins |
Trial Court Information
339th District Court
Harris
Honorable JIMMY JAMES
809814
6 mos. sj