judyrecords
search tips
700 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Heath, Patrick W., et al v. Fay Dudley, d/b/a Woodside Apts., et al

Case: 05-94-00440-CV
05-94-00440-CV
03/17/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Heath, Patrick W., et al
Fay Dudley, d/b/a Woodside Apts., et al
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/20/1994Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsCase Transferred to Another Court of Appeals
04/20/1994Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsCase Transferred to Another Court of Appeals
04/15/1994Transcript Filed
03/17/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/14/1994Appeal Bond Filed
12/16/1993Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/20/1994Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
14th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable John M Marshall
90-4319-A