Case: 08-95-00112-CR
08-95-00112-CR
04/17/1995
Other Felony
Shires, Evelyn Carmel
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
11/14/1997 | Mandate Issued | | |
11/14/1997 | Shuck purged | | |
11/14/1997 | Mandate Issued | | |
08/29/1997 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
08/29/1997 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
11/25/1996 | Submitted | | |
11/25/1996 | Submission | | |
11/25/1996 | Submitted | | |
11/18/1996 | Filed waiver of oral argument | | |
09/27/1996 | Submission | | |
07/01/1996 | Brief Filed | | |
07/01/1996 | Case ready to be set | | |
07/01/1996 | Envelope Filed, showing postmark date | | |
07/01/1996 | Case ready to be set | | |
05/29/1996 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
05/13/1996 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
04/10/1996 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/29/1996 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
02/28/1996 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
02/12/1996 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
01/17/1996 | Brief Filed | | |
01/17/1996 | Motion for leave to file disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/04/1996 | Motion for leave to * filed | | |
12/18/1995 | Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry | | |
11/15/1995 | Fee paid | | |
11/08/1995 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
11/08/1995 | Order entered | | |
11/02/1995 | Amended Motion Filed to Correct Original Motion | | |
11/02/1995 | Payment of fee due requested | | |
10/25/1995 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
10/25/1995 | Payment of fee due requested | | |
09/06/1995 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/06/1995 | Order entered | | |
08/23/1995 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
08/02/1995 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/20/1995 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
07/05/1995 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/19/1995 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
05/22/1995 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |
05/22/1995 | Transcript Filed | | |
04/17/1995 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
04/17/1995 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/14/1997 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. John W. Smith |
SHIRES, EVELYN CARMEL | Criminal - Appellant | Hon. Robert Leahey |
Trial Court Information
244th District Court
Ector
Honorable Joseph Connally
C-23,572
75 Yrs. TDC