Case: 01-94-00287-CV
01-94-00287-CV
03/17/1994
Miscellaneous/other civil
State of Texas, The
Gilbert S. Jackson; Gannett Outdoor Co. Wolfe Nursery, et al
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/24/1995 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
01/24/1995 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
12/14/1994 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |
10/27/1994 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | |
10/27/1994 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | |
09/16/1994 | Motion to dismiss appeal | | |
09/16/1994 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
08/11/1994 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
08/04/1994 | Motion to extend time to file sup brief disp | Grant motion | |
08/04/1994 | Supplemental brief filed | | |
07/29/1994 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
07/26/1994 | Motion to extend time to file sup brief | | |
07/11/1994 | Brief filed-oral argument has been requested | | |
06/30/1994 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
06/15/1994 | Response filed to a motion or to a Court order | | |
06/07/1994 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
05/19/1994 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
05/09/1994 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
05/06/1994 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
04/07/1994 | Motion to extend time to file notice of appeal dsp | Grant motion | |
04/07/1994 | Statement of facts filed | | |
04/07/1994 | Transcript filed | | |
03/17/1994 | Motion to extend time to file notice of appeal fld | | |
03/17/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/24/1995 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State | Appellee | H. Ronald Welsh |
State | Appellant | Mark A. Hopkins |
State | Appellee | Richard L. Rothfelder |
Trial Court Information
Co Civil Ct at Law No 3
Harris
541,954