Case: 13-00-00678-CR
13-00-00678-CR
11/01/2000
Murder
HUSSEIN MARTINEZ A/K/A JOSE MARTINEZ
THE STATE OF TEXAS
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/05/2002 | Mandate Recd Ct Crim App / Dt. Clk | | |||
07/31/2002 | Mandate Issued | | |||
05/09/2002 | Certificate Filed | | |||
05/02/2002 | Opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||
05/02/2002 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
03/21/2002 | Submitted | | |||
03/01/2002 | Letter sent to attorneys | | |||
02/28/2002 | Submission | | |||
02/22/2002 | Letter sent to attorneys | | |||
02/22/2002 | Reinstate appeal | | |||
01/24/2002 | Copy of Letter | | |||
01/17/2002 | Order Issued with Disposition | Abated | | ||
09/18/2001 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
09/13/2001 | No oral argument requested | | |||
09/13/2001 | Brief Filed | | |||
09/07/2001 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
08/06/2001 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
07/31/2001 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
07/12/2001 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
07/05/2001 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
06/14/2001 | Motion to withdraw as counsel | | |||
06/14/2001 | Case ready to be set | | |||
06/14/2001 | No oral argument requested | | |||
06/14/2001 | Brief Filed | | |||
05/03/2001 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
05/02/2001 | Letter filed | | |||
04/23/2001 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
04/13/2001 | Court Reporter Pages | | |||
04/13/2001 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |||
04/12/2001 | Order Entered | | |||
04/02/2001 | request for documents | | |||
03/16/2001 | ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come | | |||
03/14/2001 | request for documents | | |||
02/12/2001 | ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come | | |||
02/05/2001 | request for documents | | |||
01/10/2001 | 30 Day Letter Sent | | |||
11/08/2000 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||
11/01/2000 | Notice of Appeal Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/31/2002 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Martinez, Hussein | Appellant | Hussein Martinez |
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. Dan W. Heard |
Trial Court Information
24th District Court
Calhoun
Honorable Joseph P. Kelly
99-8-5343
99 Yrs TDCJ-ID + $222.25 Ct Costs