Case: 06-00-00233-CR
06-00-00233-CR
11/01/2000
Indecency with a Child
David Whiteley
State of Texas
No
9th Court of Appeals
11/01/2000
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/11/2002 | Mandate Issued | | |||
10/19/2001 | Opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||
10/19/2001 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | | ||
08/30/2001 | Submitted | | |||
07/27/2001 | Waiver of Oral Argument | | |||
07/19/2001 | Corrected entry made by clerks office | | |||
07/17/2001 | Case ready to be set | | |||
07/17/2001 | Brief Filed | | |||
06/29/2001 | Failure to comply with briefing rule | | |||
06/28/2001 | Brief Received (Not filed b/c excess pgs or late) | | |||
06/05/2001 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
05/29/2001 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
04/30/2001 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
04/30/2001 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
03/16/2001 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
03/16/2001 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
02/26/2001 | Brief Filed | | |||
01/23/2001 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
01/16/2001 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
01/02/2001 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
01/02/2001 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
11/09/2000 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
11/09/2000 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
11/07/2000 | Acknowledging receipt of transferred cases | | |||
11/01/2000 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals | | |||
10/17/2000 | Reporters Record Filed | | |||
10/13/2000 | Clerks Record Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/11/2002 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. Charles R. Roach |
Whiteley, David | Appellant | Hon. Russell J. Wright |
State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. Henry A. Coe |
Trial Court Information
88th District Court
Hardin
Honorable Earl B. Stover
14607
20 yrs TDCJ-ID