Case: 14-94-00265-CV
14-94-00265-CV
03/18/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Rabson, Sylvia
Rabson, William and Rabson, Robert
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
12/16/2014 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
05/08/1997 | Misc motion DISPOSED | GRANTED | |
04/30/1997 | Misc Motion filed | | |
04/12/1996 | Case stored | | |
04/12/1996 | Mandate due to be issued | | |
04/12/1996 | Mandate Issued | | |
04/12/1996 | Mandate Issued | | |
03/28/1996 | Writ of Error DISPOSED | DENIED | |
10/09/1995 | Writ of error DUE | | |
10/09/1995 | Writ of Error FILED | | |
09/07/1995 | Mtn.for en banc consideration DISPOSED-APE,ANT | OVERRULED | |
09/07/1995 | Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STA | OVERRULED | |
08/31/1995 | Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA | | |
08/25/1995 | Motion for rehearing DUE | | |
08/25/1995 | Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA | | |
08/25/1995 | Mtn.for en banc consideration FILED-ANT,APE | | |
08/10/1995 | Opinion issued | REVERSED AND REMANDED | |
08/10/1995 | Opinion issued | REVERSED AND REMANDED | |
07/13/1995 | Supplemental transcript DUE | | |
07/10/1995 | No description available. | | |
06/29/1995 | Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STA | GRANTED | |
06/22/1995 | Motion to reconsider DISPOSED - ANT, APE, APP, STA | OVERRULED | |
06/21/1995 | Response to Reply Brief FILED | | |
06/19/1995 | Mtn.to supplement transcript FILED-ANT,APE,STA | | |
06/19/1995 | Post submission brief FILED - ANT,APE | | |
06/19/1995 | Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA | | |
06/19/1995 | Supplement brief FILED-ANT,APE,PRO SE,REL,RES,STA | | |
06/15/1995 | Motion to reconsider FILED - ANT, APE, APP, STA | | |
06/15/1995 | Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STA | GRANTED | |
06/15/1995 | No description available. | | |
06/14/1995 | Submitted | | |
06/14/1995 | Submission | | |
06/14/1995 | Submitted | | |
06/13/1995 | Motion to strike DISPOSED - ANT, APE, STA | DENIED | |
06/13/1995 | Motion to Strike FILED - ANT, APE, STA | | |
06/13/1995 | Motion to Strike FILED - ANT, APE, STA | | |
06/13/1995 | Mtn.Lv. file supp.brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP | GRANTED | |
06/12/1995 | Motion to substitute attorney DISPOSED-ANT,APE | GRANTED | |
06/09/1995 | Mtn.Lv. file supp.brief FILED - ANT,APE,APP | | |
06/09/1995 | Reply Brief Filed | | |
06/08/1995 | Mtn.to supplement transcript FILED-ANT,APE,STA | | |
06/08/1995 | Supplemental transcript RECEIVED - ANT,APE,STA | | |
06/02/1995 | Motion to substitute attorney FILED-ANT,APE | | |
05/17/1995 | Submission | | |
02/16/1995 | Misc motion DISPOSED | DENIED | |
02/01/1995 | Amicus Curiae brief received | | |
02/01/1995 | Misc Motion filed | | |
12/22/1994 | Motion to Expedite Appeal DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP | DENIED | |
12/15/1994 | Motion to Expedite Appeal FILED-ANT,APE,APP | | |
09/09/1994 | Supplement brief FILED-ANT,APE,PRO SE,REL,RES,STA | | |
08/25/1994 | Mtn.Lv. file supp.brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP | GRANTED | |
08/08/1994 | Mtn.Lv. file supp.brief FILED - ANT,APE,APP | | |
08/05/1994 | Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
08/05/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |
08/05/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |
07/07/1994 | Motion to file reply briefDISPOSED-ANT,APE,REL,RES | GRANTED | |
07/07/1994 | Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STA | GRANTED | |
07/07/1994 | No description available. | | |
06/27/1994 | Motion to file reply brief FILED - ANT,APE,REL,RES | | |
06/24/1994 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
06/22/1994 | Mtn.to supplement transcript FILED-ANT,APE,STA | | |
06/22/1994 | Supplemental transcript RECEIVED - ANT,APE,STA | | |
06/16/1994 | No description available. | | |
06/09/1994 | Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
06/09/1994 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
06/06/1994 | Brf.RECD.ARGU.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA | | |
05/26/1994 | Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STA | GRANTED | |
05/24/1994 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
05/19/1994 | Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP | GRANTED | |
05/19/1994 | Misc motion DISPOSED | GRANTED | |
05/13/1994 | Mtn.to supplement transcript FILED-ANT,APE,STA | | |
05/06/1994 | Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA | | |
05/02/1994 | Extend time to file statement of facts FILED | | |
04/27/1994 | No description available. | | |
04/25/1994 | Supplemental transcript RECEIVED - ANT,APE,STA | | |
04/21/1994 | Ext.time file Supp.State.FactsDISPOSED-ANT,APE,STA | GRANTED | |
04/08/1994 | Ext.time to file supp.statement of facts FILED | | |
03/31/1994 | Extend time to file record FILED-ANT,APE | GRANTED | |
03/31/1994 | Record Filed (Both records FILED) | | |
03/21/1994 | Transcript received only; mtn. pending | | |
03/18/1994 | Extend time to file transcript FILED-ANT,APE | | |
03/18/1994 | Statement of Facts RECEIVED - ANT, APP, REL | | |
03/18/1994 | Statement of Facts RECEIVED - ANT, APP, REL | | |
03/18/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
02/15/1994 | Bond FILED | | |
12/17/1993 | Motion for new trial FILED | | |
11/18/1993 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/12/1996 | Case Stored | Case stored |
12/16/2014 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
HEIDI JENNY ESTATE | Appellee | Ray E. Dittimar |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Appellant | |
RABSON, WILLIAM AND RABSON, RO | Appellee | Rayford J. Black, Jr. Sharon Brand Gardner David Wallace Michael J. Cenatiempo |
Rabson, Sylvia | Appellant | H. Victor Thomas Sylvia Rabson |
Trial Court Information
Probate Court No 1
Harris
Honorable JOHN A. HUTCHISON
247,321-401