judyrecords
search tips
700 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

JOE DOUGLAS PRICKETT v. BARBARA PRICKETT

Case: A-7023
A-7023
09/23/1958
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
JOE DOUGLAS PRICKETT
BARBARA PRICKETT
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/05/1959Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed
01/13/1959Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/12/1958Response to Brief filedPetitioner
10/29/1958Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
10/28/1958Brief on the MeritsRespondent
10/24/1958Exhibits in case/cause filedPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/05/1959Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed
01/20/1959Response to Motion filed
01/20/1959Motion to dismissOverruled
01/13/1959Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/31/1958Opinion issued
11/12/1958Response to Brief filed
10/29/1958Brief on the Merits
10/28/1958Brief on the Merits
10/24/1958Exhibits in case/cause filed
10/21/1958Motion for extension of time to argue. See remarks
09/30/1958Document filed (see remarks)
09/30/1958Bond
09/26/1958Motion for leave to file brief
09/26/1958Order from Lower Court filed
09/23/1958motion for leave to file petition
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Barbara PrickettRespondent
Joe Douglas PrickettPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information