Case: A-7042
A-7042
10/20/1958
Application for Writ of Error
AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
A. J. KELLEY
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/08/1959 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
05/05/1959 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
05/01/1959 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
04/30/1959 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
02/13/1959 | Supplemental Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
02/09/1959 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent | | |
11/03/1958 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
10/20/1958 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/08/1959 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
06/24/1959 | Opinion issued | | ||
05/11/1959 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
05/05/1959 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
05/01/1959 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
04/30/1959 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
04/15/1959 | Concurring Opinion issued. | | ||
04/15/1959 | Dissenting opinion issued. | | ||
04/15/1959 | Opinion issued | | ||
02/13/1959 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
02/09/1959 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
01/21/1959 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
11/03/1958 | Response to Petition | | ||
10/20/1958 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
10/20/1958 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Henry W. Strasburger | Amicus Curiae | |
Chilton Bryan | Amicus Curiae | |
AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY | Petitioner | |
A. J. Kelley | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information