Case: A-6996
A-6996
08/18/1958
Application for Writ of Error
LOU G. MUNDEN, ET VIR
J. F. (SKEET) CHAMBLESS
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/06/1958 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
10/07/1958 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
09/24/1958 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
08/18/1958 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/06/1958 | Motion for Rehearing | | ||
10/07/1958 | Reply to Response | | ||
09/24/1958 | Response to Petition | | ||
08/26/1958 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Response | | ||
08/18/1958 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
08/18/1958 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Lou G. Munden, et vir | Petitioner | |
J. F. (Skeet) Chambless | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information