Case Information: 39489 | |||
Short Caption: | SALVARINI VS. DISTRICT COURT (CASE) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D270313 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Prohibition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 03/10/2003 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/16/2002 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from J.P. Kemp, Attorney at Law--check no. 1477. | ||
04/16/2002 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Prohibition. | 02-06778 | |
05/13/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Answer Writ Petition. The real party in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. | 02-08286 | |
05/21/2002 | Petition/Writ | Filed Answer to Petition for Writ. Answer to Petitioner Edgardo Salvarini's Peittion for Writ of Prohibition. | 02-08947 | |
06/24/2002 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Address. James P. Kemp. | 02-10905 | |
09/25/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Petitioner shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file a copy of the judgment or order challenged by the petition and the proper affidavit of the party beneficially interested or affidavit of petitioner's attorney with proof of service of the affidavit. | 02-16639 | |
10/07/2002 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Affidavit. Affidavit of James P. Kemp, Esq., Verifying Petition for Writ of Prohibition. | 02-17278 | |
10/17/2002 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. from attorney J.P. Kemp in response to this court's order filed 9/25/02. | 02-18125 | |
10/21/2002 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Entry of Order. No district court file stamp. Attached to letter received on 10/17/02. | 11-20861 | |
10/21/2002 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Order/Judgment. filed in district court on: 10/09/02. Attached to letter received on 10/17/02. Copy not certified. | 02-18231 | |
10/21/2002 | Transcript | Filed a partial transcript that was attached to the letter received on 10/17/02 (no cover page-last page contains certification from the court reporter). | 11-20862 | |
03/10/2003 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Oral Argument will not be scheduled and this matter shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the papers filed herein. | 03-03927 | |
03/10/2003 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP03-MS/ML/NB | ||
05/15/2003 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. for Writ of Prohibition. We conclude that extraordinary relief is not warranted and " . . . we deny the petition." SNP03-MS/ML/NB | 03-08265 | |
06/10/2003 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 03-08574 | |
06/10/2003 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |